Young, Jody-Lynn (CPSO#: 114046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Physicial Medicine and
Rehabilitation
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODY-LYNN YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2018 to 04 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 05 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2017