Younker, Marika Anne Louwe (CPSO#: 88642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 1M144
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 530-6175
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Younker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Younker ( CPSO# 88642 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Suite 1M144
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIKA ANNE LOUWE YOUNKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014