Yousef, Amin Mohammed Hasan A (CPSO#: 77260)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005