Yousef, Yacoub Abdallah Yacoub (CPSO#: 97084)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012