Yousif, Ihsan Ghdban (CPSO#: 91817)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2009 to 19 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010