Yousif, Mazin Ablahad (CPSO#: 92019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yonge Davis Centre
C2b
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8A7
Phone: (905) 898-3700
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mazin Yousif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yousif ( CPSO# 92019 )

Business Address:
Yonge Davis Centre
C2B
17480 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8A7
Phone Number: (905) 898-3700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAZIN ABLAHAD YOUSIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSIF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011