Youssef, Fady (CPSO#: 77480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 748-4908
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fady Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Youssef ( CPSO# 77480 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADY YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004