Youssef, George Youssef Ibrahim (CPSO#: 91607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
the Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Room C-120
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE YOUSSEF IBRAHIM YOUSSEF shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. YOUSSEF is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. YOUSSEF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. YOUSSEF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. YOUSSEF shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. YOUSSEF is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. YOUSSEF no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019