Youssef, Nancy Abdou Bassily (CPSO#: 72694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 221-0451
Fax: (416) 221-2082
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Youssef ( CPSO# 72694 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 221-0451

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ABDOU BASSILY YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2001