Youssef, Tarek (CPSO#: 89744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Youssef, Tarek Ahmed Abdul-Salam (used until: 10 Sep 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
127 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3H1
Phone: (613) 933-9100
Fax: (613) 933-9990
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tarek Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Youssef ( CPSO# 89744 )

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
127 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3H1
Phone Number: (613) 933-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Tarek  Ahmed  Abdul-Salam  Youssef  may practise medicine independently in
            Ophthalmology, only.