Youssef, Victor Samir Fawzy (CPSO#: 90368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trinity Medical Centre
Unit 4
2163 Sixth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 3N7
Phone: (905) 582-5030
Fax: (905) 582-5010
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Victor Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Youssef ( CPSO# 90368 )

Business Address:
2163 Sixth Line
Suite 4
Oakville ON  L6H 3N7
Phone Number: (905) 582-5030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR SAMIR FAWZY YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010