Yu, Derek (CPSO#: 83010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Rutherford Road
Suite 204
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: (289) 583-0202
Fax: (866) 215-1066
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (866) 215 1066
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yu ( CPSO# 83010 )

Business Address:
115 Allison Ann Way
Vaughan ON  L6A 0G7
Phone Number: (647) 968-4992

Business Address:
204 - 2200 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Phone Number: (289) 583-0202

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2010