Yu, Jian Zhuang (CPSO#: 78405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4054
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jian Z. Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yu ( CPSO# 78405 )

Business Address:
Unit 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Business Address:
Suite 500
1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Department of Anesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIAN ZHUANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005