Yu, Joanne Linda (CPSO#: 88881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 208
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (647) 352-3674
Fax: (647) 352-0070
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE LINDA YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2013