Yu, Ryan Shange (CPSO#: 95223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 25 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN SHANGE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2018