Yu, Stanley Sheng-Fan (CPSO#: 23738)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 403 - 849 Upper Wentworth St Hamilton, ON L9A 5H4 Tel: 905-388-5996
Instructions: Medical records location as per above c/o Dr. A. Alipio.
Date Received: 23 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018