Yu, Yang (CPSO#: 93338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:China Medical University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Ontario Laboratory
661 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G1M1
Phone: 647-792-3205
Fax: 416-649-4512
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 17 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 17 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017