Yuan, George (CPSO#: 92166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
764 Baker Cres Unit B
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Phone: 613-389-4400
Fax: 613-389-4450
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7-55 Frid St
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Canada
Phone: 905-529-2259
Fax: 905-529-2262
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Yuan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yuan ( CPSO# 92166 )

Business Address:
Unit B
764 Baker Crescent
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Phone Number: (613) 389-4400

Business Address:
7 - 55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 207-9100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE YUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012