Yudin, Alexandra (CPSO#: 84512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prime Care FHT
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 878-6793
Fax: (905) 878-6711
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Yudin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yudin ( CPSO# 84512 )

Business Address:
Prime Care FHT
206 - 470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 878-6793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA YUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009