Yudin, Jovana (CPSO#: 88882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive, Suite 102
Etobicoke, ON
M9C 5N2
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: 416-622-4762
Fax: 416-622-4763
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Medical Clinics, 2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke, M9C 1A5
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-521-4196
Fax: 416-521-4076
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jovana Yudin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yudin ( CPSO# 88882 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners - Q Site
Medical Clinics, 2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
Sherway Medical Clinic
Suite 102
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOVANA YUDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2013