Yuen, Darana Wai-Sum (CPSO#: 80948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Yau, Darana Wai-Sum (used until: 30 Nov 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
EyeMD Institute
Suite 401
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone: (905) 456-9500
Fax: (905) 456-9508
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uptown Eye Specialists
Suite 221
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 761-7002
Fax: (905) 761-7003
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jasper Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuen ( CPSO# 81672 )
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 80948 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100


Corporation Name: Darana Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuen ( CPSO# 81672 )
Dr. D. Yuen ( CPSO# 80948 )

Business Address:
EyeMD Institute
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 456-9500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARANA WAI-SUM YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009