Yuh, Joseph Young Jae (CPSO#: 74979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Yuh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yuh ( CPSO# 74979 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 751-6141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH YOUNG JAE YUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002