Yung, Yick Shing (CPSO#: 27160)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Fuzhou, Mandarin

Education:University of New South Wales, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.S. Yung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2016