Yusuf, Aroon Yaseen (CPSO#: 79493)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012