Yuzda, Edward Stephen (CPSO#: 74083)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2005