Fadavi, Ziba (CPSO#: 78599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarbrough and Rouge hospital
Birchmount Capmus
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4891
Fax: (416) 281-7486
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fadavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Fadavi ( CPSO# 78599 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIBA FADAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008