Zabtia, Nazar R (CPSO#: 80717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
Unit 221
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 813 6236
Fax: (289) 837 2168
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zabtia & Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nuri ( CPSO# 87950 )
Dr. N. Zabtia ( CPSO# 80717 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 221
Oakville ON  L6L 1M1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZAR R ZABTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZABTIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 23 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2005 to 26 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2006 to 26 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2007 to 26 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009