Zacny, Jordan Tyler (CPSO#: 88712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhida Zacny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zacny ( CPSO# 88712 )
Dr. A. Mukhida ( CPSO# 88999 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Road South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1

Business Address:
Milton Centre for Womens Health
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 4, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Jordan Tyler Zacny,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Zacny to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. JORDAN TYLER ZACNY
                                          ("Dr. Zacny")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Zacny, certificate of registration number 88712, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215223 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my anesthesiology
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that I entered into a practice agreement with
                  Halton Healthcare ("Hospital") on June 9, 2016 (the "Practice
                  Agreement"), requiring that I, among other things:

                  (a)   engage in clinical supervision for a period of six (6) months
                        ("Clinical Supervision") under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor chosen by the Hospital ("Clinical Supervisor"); and
                  
                  (b)   engage in professional education, including: (1) a minimum two-day
                        course in anesthesia simulation oriented to managing complex
                        patients and anesthesia complications; and (2) the Ontario Medical
                        Association's Crucial Conversations and Crucial Accountability
                        Companion Course ("Professional Education").
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that I have completed the Clinical Supervision
                  and Professional Education required by the Practice Agreement.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Zacny, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zacny, undertake that, approximately four (4) months after
                        the Effective Date, I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice
                        ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the
                        College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zacny, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zacny, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of the Effective Date.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zacny, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zacny, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zacny, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Zacny was the subject of a College investigation into
                              whether he engaged in professional misconduct or is
                              incompetent in his anesthesiology practice. As a result of
                              the investigation, Dr. Zacny's practice will be reassessed by
                              an assessor selected by the College within 4 months of the
                              date of the undertaking.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Zacny, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to my Clinical Supervisor, and/or all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Zacny, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Zacny, give my irrevocable consent to my Clinical Supervisor, and
                  all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jordan Tyler Zacny to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 4, 2017:

Dr. Zacny was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his anesthesiology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Zacny’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 4 months of the date of the undertaking.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)