Zadhoush, Kourosh (CPSO#: 91361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Isfahan University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bradford Medical Centre
Unit 7
PO Box 207
157 Holland Street East
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A8
Phone: (905) 551-6555
Fax: (905) 551-7655
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TOP CARE HEALTH CENTRE
10171 YONGE STREET
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T5
Canada
Phone: 365-887-4499
Fax: 365-887-4550
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kourosh Zadhoush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zadhoush ( CPSO# 91361 )

Business Address:
101171 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T5
Phone Number: (365) 887-4499

Business Address:
Bradford Medical Centre
Unit 7
157 Holland Street East
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A8
Phone Number: (905) 551-6555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOUROSH ZADHOUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZADHOUSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011