Zafar, Saira (CPSO#: 84897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
E6-307 A LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58132
Fax: (519) 685-8357
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saira Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zafar ( CPSO# 84897 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
E6-307A
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIRA ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010