Zahirieh, Alireza (CPSO#: 77807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
CNIB Kidney Centre
1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 382
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-7881
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahirieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zahirieh ( CPSO# 77807 )
Dr. A. Konvalinka ( CPSO# 79578 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Suite 382
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 480-4976

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Suite 11-PMB-189
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIREZA ZAHIRIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHIRIEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006