Zahrani, Mohammed Ahmed M (CPSO#: 92606)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 01 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018