Zaidi, Ali (CPSO#: 87036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32615
Fax: (519) 685-8127
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI ZAIDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ZAIDI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ZAIDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAIDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ZAIDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ZAIDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ZAIDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Sep 2008 to 03 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019