Zaidi, Mudassir Ali (CPSO#: 90492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dow Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1813 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone: (705) 222-9038
Fax: (705) 222-9041
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mudassir A. Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zaidi ( CPSO# 90492 )

Business Address:
1813 LaSalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 222-9038

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUDASSIR ALI ZAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011