Zaidi, Mukarram Ali (CPSO#: 90273)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 22 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mukarram Ali Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2013

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 07 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 30 Aug 2010 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2013