Zajdlik, Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 59378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hope Health Centre
21 Yarmouth Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4G2
Phone: (519) 822-6700
Fax: (519) 822-6704
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ARCH Clinic
Unit 115
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
Phone: (519) 780-5298
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne-Marie Zajdlik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zajdlik ( CPSO# 59378 )

Business Address:
21 Yarmouth Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4G2
Phone Number: (519) 822-6700

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE ZAJDLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAJDLIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1989

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)