Zak, Eva (CPSO#: 61437)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Date of Death: 5-Dec-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Polish, Slovak

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003