Zakaluzny, Ihor Andrew (CPSO#: 60476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandria VAMC
2495 Shreveport Hwy 71 N
Pineville LA  71360
United States
Phone: (318) 466-2384

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Maine
USA - Maryland
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - West Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHOR ANDREW ZAKALUZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKALUZNY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: July 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On April 10, 2018, the State of Maine Board of Licensure in Medicine entered into a Consent Agreement with Dr. Zakaluzny imposing (a) a reprimand for engaging in unprofessional conduct (namely, urinating outside an office building within sight of an examination room and having been seen by a patient) and (b) a civil penalty of $1000. The Consent Agreement was entered into in place of a hearing, but it constitutes discipline and is an adverse licensing action. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on May 3, 2018.