Zakhary, Jena Mourad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 94498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University Of Antigua, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
2555 Victoria Park Ave.
Scarborough ON  M1T1A3
Phone: (416) 551-7069
Fax: (647) 689-4621
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jena Zakhary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zakhary ( CPSO# 94498 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
2555 Victoria Park Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 551-7069

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENA MOURAD IBRAHIM ZAKHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012