Zakhary, Mariam Rizk (CPSO#: 80119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-2515
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariam Zakhary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zakhary ( CPSO# 80119 )

Business Address:
38 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM RIZK ZAKHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2013