Zaki, Amna (CPSO#: 87002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington ON  L7S1W7
Canada
Phone: 2893086341
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amna Zaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaki ( CPSO# 87002 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNA ZAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013