Zaki, Dina (CPSO#: 111406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 18 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smtyh Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINA ZAKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ZAKI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ZAKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ZAKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ZAKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ZAKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ZAKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2017 to 26 Feb 2017
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2017 to 12 Mar 2017
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018