Zaki, Salma (CPSO#: 90459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Orchard Heights Boulevard
Unit 103
Aurora ON  L4G 6T5
Phone: (289) 648-1616
Fax: (289) 648-1617
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16880 Yonge Street
Unit # 1
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Canada
Phone: 905-895-9777
Fax: 905-895-9720
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S Zaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zaki ( CPSO# 90459 )

Business Address:
16880 Yonge Street
Suite 1
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-9777

Business Address:
24 Orchard Heights Boulevard
Unit 103
Aurora ON  L4G 6T5
Phone Number: (289) 648-1616

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMA ZAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2012