Zalan, Peter Gabor (CPSO#: 24769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Dental Group
36 Elgin St
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3C 5B4
Phone: 705-673-5615
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Zalan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zalan ( CPSO# 24769 )

Business Address:
36 Elgin Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 5B4
Phone Number: (705) 673-5615

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GABOR ZALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 31 Dec 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 1998 to 20 Sep 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972