Zaman, Neshmi (CPSO#: 103331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto Scarborough
Health & Wellness Centre
Student Centre, SL-270
Toronto ON  M1C 1A4
Phone: 416-287-7065
Fax: 416-287-7069
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Zaman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zaman ( CPSO# 90195 )
Dr. A. Zaman-Haque ( CPSO# 98500 )
Dr. N. Zaman ( CPSO# 103331)

Business Address:
3502 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 984-6172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NESHMI ZAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016