Zambrana, Carola (CPSO#: 94499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Ross University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Santa Cabrini Hospital
5655 St Zotique Street East
Montreal QC  H1T 1P7
Phone: (514) 252-6444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLA ZAMBRANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMBRANA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 May 2014 to 20 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014