Zamil, Hani Ahmed Mohammed (CPSO#: 94235)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013