Zamir, Orit (CPSO#: 93582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
360 Dupont Street
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M5R 1V9
Phone: (647) 823-2428
Fax: (647) 352-2429
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Comp
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orit Zamir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Zamir ( CPSO# 93582 )

Business Address:
360 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1V9
Phone Number: (647) 823-2428

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Management Centre
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Toronto Academic Pain Medicine Institute
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Health Network Pain Clinic
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ORIT ZAMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015