Zammit-Maempel, Joseph George (CPSO#: 97091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Maltese

Education:University of Dundee, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Niagara Family Health
Centre
22 Ontario St
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph George Zammit-Maempel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zammit-Maempel ( CPSO# 97091 )

Business Address:
McMaster Niagara Family Health Centre
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone Number: (905) 984-3335

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 02 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 02 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  June  30,  2017,  the  following  is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Joseph  George
            Zammit-Maempel, in accordance  with  an  undertaking  and  consent given by Dr.
            Zammit-Maempel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. JOSEPH GEORGE ZAMMIT-MAEMPEL
                                          ("Dr. Zammit-Maempel")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which  is Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries,  Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic  Control  Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control  Regulations made
                  under  the  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996,  c.  19,  as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs"  means  from  Part  G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines   and  Other  Targeted  Substances"   means   from   the
                  Benzodiazepines and  Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A  summary of the  above-named  drugs  [from  Appendix  I  to  the
                        Compendium  of  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A";  and  the  current  regulatory  lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All  other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics  Safety
                  and Awareness  Act,  2010,  S.O.  2010,  c.  22,  as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS"  means  the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics  Monitoring
                  System implemented  under  the  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's  register  that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, certificate of registration  number  97091,  am  a
                  member of the College.  

            (3)   I,  Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that the College received information
                  from  the  NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215645
                  (the "Investigation")  into  whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or  am  incompetent  in  my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to abide by the provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                  Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored  Drugs,  in the form attached
                  as  set  out in Schedule "D", which will include at least  the  following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the  name  of  the  medication  prescribed,  dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether  the  prescription  is  for  a new medication  and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently  prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Zammit-Maempel's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review  (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the  Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable,  as  set
                              out below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to  keep a copy of all prescriptions I
                  write  for  Narcotic  Drugs,  Narcotic  Preparations,  Controlled  Drugs,
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances  and  All  other  Monitored
                  Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to practise under the guidance  of
                        a  clinical  supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of seven (7) months on the terms set
                        out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of
                        Clinical Supervision  set  out  below  will  only  be  reduced upon
                        recommendation  of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval  by  the
                        College.
                  
                  Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of four (4)  weeks  on  the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to  meet  with  my
                        Clinical  Supervisor(s)  at  least  once  every week to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                        i.    20  charts  for patients to whom I have  prescribed  Narcotic
                              Drugs,    Narcotic     Preparations,     Controlled    Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances  and  All other
                              Monitored  Drugs  since  the  Clinical  Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review,  or  if  there  are  not  20 patients listed  in  the
                              Prescribing  Log  since  the Clinical  Supervisor(s)'s  prior
                              review,  then  the  charts of  all  patients  listed  in  the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                        ii.   the chart of every patient  to  whom  I  have initiated a new
                              prescription  for  Narcotic  Drugs,  Narcotic   Preparations,
                              Controlled   Drugs,   Benzodiazepines   and   Other  Targeted
                              Substances  and/or  All  other  Monitored  Drugs  since   the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  during  Phase  1,  the
                        Clinical  Supervisor(s)  must  sign and date the Prescribing Log to
                        confirm the charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and
                        discussed with me.
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  during  Phase  1,  the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will  provide  a  report  to  the College at
                        least once every two weeks.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that after a minimum of four (4)
                        weeks of Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I
                        have the necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice  in a
                        less  highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
                  
                  Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")
                  
                  (h)   Upon the  recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to engage in Phase
                        2 of Clinical  Supervision  for  a minimum of two (2) months on the
                        terms set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to  meet with my
                        Clinical  Supervisor(s) at least bi-weekly to discuss the  Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                        i.    15 charts  for  patients  to  whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs,     Narcotic    Preparations,    Controlled     Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines  and  Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored  Drugs  since the  Clinical  Supervisor(s)'s  prior
                              review,  or if there  are  not  15  patients  listed  in  the
                              Prescribing  Log  since  the  Clinical  Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review,  then  the  charts  of  all  patients listed  in  the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                        ii.   the  chart of every patient to whom I have  initiated  a  new
                              prescription   for  Narcotic  Drugs,  Narcotic  Preparations,
                              Controlled  Drugs,   Benzodiazepines   and   Other   Targeted
                              Substances   and/or  All  other  Monitored  Drugs  since  the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review. 
                  
                  (j)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  during  Phase  2,  the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)  must  sign  and date the Prescribing Log to
                        confirm the charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and
                        discussed with me.
                  
                  (k)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  during  Phase  2,  the
                        Clinical  Supervisor(s) will provide a report  to  the  College  at
                        least once every two weeks.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge that after a minimum of two (2)
                        months of Phase 2, if the  Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that
                        I have the necessary knowledge,  skills and judgment to practice in
                        a less highly supervised environment,  the  Clinical  Supervisor(s)
                        may recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
                  Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")
                  
                  (m)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and  approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to engage in Phase
                        3  of Clinical Supervision for a minimum of four (4) months on  the
                        terms set out below.
                  
                  (n)   During  Phase  3,  I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to meet with my
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)  at  least  once  every month to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                        i.    15  charts  for patients to whom I have  prescribed  Narcotic
                              Drugs,    Narcotic     Preparations,     Controlled    Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances  and  All other
                              Monitored  Drugs  since  the  Clinical  Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review,  or  if  there  are  not  15 patients listed  in  the
                              Prescribing  Log  since  the Clinical  Supervisor(s)'s  prior
                              review,  then  the  charts of  all  patients  listed  in  the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                        ii.   the chart of every patient  to  whom  I  have initiated a new
                              prescription  for  Narcotic  Drugs,  Narcotic   Preparations,
                              Controlled   Drugs,   Benzodiazepines   and   Other  Targeted
                              Substances  and/or  All  other  Monitored  Drugs  since   the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review. 
                  
                  (o)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  during  Phase  3,  the
                        Clinical  Supervisor(s)  must  sign and date the Prescribing Log to
                        confirm the charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and
                        discussed with me.
                  
                  (p)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  during  Phase  3,  the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will  provide  a  report  to  the College at
                        least once every month.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that after a minimum  of six (6)
                        months of Phase 3, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied  that
                        I  have  the  necessary  knowledge, skills and judgment to practice
                        without supervision, the Clinical  Supervisor(s)  may  recommend to
                        the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge and undertake that the  Clinical
                        Supervision  will  only  cease  upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (s)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  I  have  reviewed  the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s undertaking,  attached  hereto as Schedule
                        "E", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).
                        In  addition  to what is set out above, the Clinical  Supervisor(s)
                        will, at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate   the   education   program   set   out   in   the
                              Individualized  Education  Plan  ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising  from  chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make  recommendations  to  me  for practice improvements  and
                              ongoing  professional  development   and   inquire   into  my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform  any  other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews  with  staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical  Supervisor(s)  deems  necessary   to   my  Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)  will take place at my Practice Location, or  another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that all charts reviewed shall
                        be independently selected by the Clinical  Supervisor(s)  based  on
                        the educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F"
                        to  my  Undertaking,  as well as the areas of concern identified in
                        the report of the medical  inspector  dated  Febraury  25 2017, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to  cooperate  fully with  the
                        Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under  the  terms of
                        this  Undertaking  and  Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by  the
                        reasonable recommendations  of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but   not   limited   to,  any  reasonable   recommended   practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to  ensure  that Schedule "E" to
                        this  Undertaking,  is signed and delivered to the  College  within
                        fourteen (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (x)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking  in Schedule "E"  to  this  Undertaking  is  unable  or
                        unwilling to continue  to  fulfill  its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice  of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly  qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (y)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  agree  that if I am unable  to  obtain  a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the terms set  out in sections (7)(w) and/or
                        (x)  above,  I  will  cease  prescribing Narcotic  Drugs,  Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs,  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored  Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (z)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  agree that if  I  am  required  to  cease
                        prescribing  Narcotic  Drugs,   Narcotic  Preparations,  Controlled
                        Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other  Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored  Drugs  as a result of section  (7)(y)  above  this  will
                        constitute a term,  condition  or  limitation  on my certificate of
                        registration  and  that  term,  condition  or  limitation  will  be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete  all  elements  of  the detailed IEP, attached  hereto  as
                        Schedule "F", including but not  limited to, the following elements
                        of professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   In the course of this investigation,  I,  Dr. Zammit-Maempel,
                              voluntarily enrolled in the University of Toronto  Faculty of
                              Medicine  program  in  Safe  Opioid  Prescribing  (all  three
                              webinars           and          in-person          workshop):
                              www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                        (ii)  Review  and  discuss  with   my  Clinical  Supervisor(s)  the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO         Policy        "Prescribing         Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                              2.    the 2017 Canadian  Guideline  for  Opioids  for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer                                        Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid;
                              3.    CMPA  advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids
                  
                        (iii) any  additional  professional  education  recommended  by  my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake to provide proof to the College of
                        my successful  completion  of  each  element  of  the  Professional
                        Education   specified   above,  including  proof  of  registration,
                        attendance  and participant  assessment  reports  where  available,
                        within one (1)  month  of completion of each element. I acknowledge
                        that the College will determine,  in its sole discretion, whether I
                        have  successfully  completed  each  element  of  the  Professional
                        Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that  a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress  and  compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after  the  Clinical  Supervision set out under section  7  of  the
                        Undertaking has ceased,  I  will  submit  to  a  reassessment of my
                        practice by an assessor or assessors selected by the  College  (the
                        "Reassessment").

                  (b)   I,  Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment
                        may include  a  chart  review,  direct  observation  of my care, an
                        interview   of  me,  interviews  with  colleagues  and  co-workers,
                        feedback from  patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake  to  co-operate  fully  with  the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  and  agree  that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)   may   receive  and  review  the  findings  of   the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss  with  the  Assessor(s)  any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that  the  results  of   the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        that  the  Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the
                        College.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location at which I  practise  or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s)  and  office(s),  in any
                        jurisdiction  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within  ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within  ten  (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, undertake  and  agree that I will submit to,
                        and  not  interfere with, unannounced inspections  of  my  Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes of  monitoring  my  compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, give my  irrevocable  consent to the College
                        to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health  Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"),   the   Drug   Program  Services  Branch,  the  Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS")  implemented  under  the Narcotics Safety
                        and  Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution  who  may
                        have relevant  information,  in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge  that  I  have executed the OHIP
                        and  NMS  consent  form(s),  attached  hereto as Schedule  "G"  and
                        Schedule "H", respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that all schedules  attached  to  or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I,  Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge and confirm  that  I  have  read  and
                  understand  the  provisions  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge  that  the  College  will provide this
                  Undertaking   to  any  Chief  of  Staff,  or  a  colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that a breach by me of any provision
                  of  this Undertaking may constitute an  act  of  professional  misconduct
                  and/or   incompetence,   and  may  result  in  a  referral  of  specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge   that   this   entire  Undertaking
                  constitutes  terms,  conditions,  and  limitations  on my certificate  of
                  registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I,  Dr. Zammit-Maempel, acknowledge that, during  the  time  period
                        that  this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  acknowledge  that,  in  addition  to  this
                        Undertaking  being posted in accordance with the section above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The  College   received   information   from   the  Narcotics
                              Monitoring  System about Dr. Zammit-Maempel's prescribing  of
                              controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Based on the  information  received, the College conducted an
                              investigation  into  whether  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel  failed  to
                              maintain the standard of practice  of  the  profession and/or
                              was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled  substances,
                              including narcotics.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr.  Zammit-Maempel's  prescribing  of narcotic  drugs,
                                    narcotic      preparations,      controlled      drugs,
                                    benzodiazepines  and  other  targeted  substances,  and
                                    other  monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical
                                    Supervisor  acceptable  to the College for a minimum of
                                    seven (7) months. 
                  
                              *     Dr.   Zammit-Maempel   will  engage   in   professional
                                    education in the prescribing  of controlled substances,
                                    including narcotics.
                  
                              *     Following  the  professional education  and  period  of
                                    supervision,  Dr.   Zammit-Maempel's   prescribing   of
                                    controlled  substances,  including  narcotics,  will be
                                    re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I,  Dr.  Zammit-Maempel,  give  my  irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide  the  following  information to  any  person  who  requires  this
                  information  for  the purposes  of  facilitating  my  completion  of  the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information  arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising  from  the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel, give my irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to
                  provide  all  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances  of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information  arising from the  monitoring  of  my  compliance  with  this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Zammit-Maempel,  give  my  irrevocable  consent  to any person who
                  facilitates  my  completion  of the Professional Education,  and  to  all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of  Staff  and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring  my  compliance  with  this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which  comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional  Education  and  which  he  or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph George Zammit-Maempel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 30, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Zammit-Maempel’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Zammit-Maempel failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Zammit-Maempel’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of seven (7) months.

- Dr. Zammit-Maempel will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

- Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Zammit-Maempel’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.