Zamora, Jorge Enrique (CPSO#: 63705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: 613-507-7246
Fax: 613-344-1203
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. E. Zamora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zamora ( CPSO# 63705 )

Business Address:
797 Princess Street
Suite 500
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 507-7246

Business Address:
19 Hospital Ddrive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1858

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 15, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On February 15, 2017, Kingston General Hospital and Hotel Dieu Hospital (the “hospitals”) notified the College that Dr. Jorge Zamora resigned his privileges at the hospitals effective February 15, 2017, prior to a recommendation by the hospitals to their respective Medical Advisory Committees and Boards to revoke Dr. Zamora’s privileges at the hospitals.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORGE ENRIQUE ZAMORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1992

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)